+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 19, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0216)
On March 14, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 216 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1926ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Motion to refer to committee agreed to
- Read first time
On January 12, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Science and Technology (20-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/08/01 010512200
+ − Votes (8)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: Reported from General Laws (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2001: Reported from Appropriations (19-Y 0-N)
January 12, 2001: Reported from Science and Technology (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor