+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 294 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1923ER)
- Enrolled
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1923H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104308D-H1
- Read second time
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104308D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #3
On January 9, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101543D
+ − Votes (6)
February 13, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2013: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2013: Reported from Finance with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (3-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (33)
Type:
Primary Sponsor