+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 22, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0381)
On March 18, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 381 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 7, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 27, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1923ER)
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Wills/Trusts/Estates
On February 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 3-N)
On January 31, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 2-N)
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3/4
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed LD8584152
+ − Votes (5)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 3-N)
January 27, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice (17-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor