+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0163)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 163 (effective 7/1/21)
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2021
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1921ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Election Administration
On January 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101908D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2021: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2021: Reported from Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2021: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2021: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor