+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0736)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Enacted, Chapter 736 (effective 7/1/15)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 4-N)
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1917ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1917ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 15104248D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1917H1
On February 7, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104248D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103309D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 15, 2015: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (38-Y 0-N)
April 15, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N)
February 19, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (4-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2015: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor