+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 25, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2021 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 21, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101909D