+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (47)
On March 30, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0567)
On March 24, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 567 (effective 7/1/95)
On March 16, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 13, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1915ER)
On February 28, 1995 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed LD4251352-H1
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
- Substitute recommended by conference committee
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Senators: Marsh, Saslaw, Stolle
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Delegates: Melvin, Woodrum, Miller
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 24, 1995 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (3-Y 96-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 96-N)
On February 22, 1995 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. LD6385352-S1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD6385352-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed LD6385352-S1
On February 19, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Law
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed LD2054156
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
February 24, 1995: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 96-N)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 19, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1995: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor