+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N)
- Read third time and passed House (60-Y 39-N)
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1914H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 21104073D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Incorporates HB1835 (Subramanyam)
- Committee substitute printed 21104073D-H1
- Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N)
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned L & C sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101429D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
February 5, 2021: VOTE: Passage (60-Y 39-N)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2021: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (12-Y 9-N)
February 1, 2021: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 4-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor