+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0112)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 112 (effective - see bill)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 21, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/14/17
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1913ER)
- Enrolled
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 2-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 2-N 1-A)
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1913H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 17104391D-H1
- Read second time
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 17104391D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17103593D