+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 18, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0236)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 236 (effective 7/1/11)
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2011 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1912ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
On February 18, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2011 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1912H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 11104630D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 11104630D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (13-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned C & L sub: #3 Special Subcommittee on Energy
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11102667D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 21, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 17, 2011: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendment (14-Y 1-N)
February 7, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2011: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (13-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor