+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (60)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0850)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 850 (effective 7/1/19)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
- Communicated to Governor
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate rejected Governor's recommendation (11-Y 27-N)
- Passed by temporarily
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (37-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (32-Y 6-N)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (99-Y 0-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 19107782D-H3
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1911ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 2-N)
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 19107667D-H2
- Amended by conference committee
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute with amendment rejected by House 19106735D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Peace, Adams, L.R., Hope
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
- Senators: Carrico, Obenshain, Petersen
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (37-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB1911S1
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106735D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 19106735D-S1
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1911H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19106242D-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19106242D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (18-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101248D