+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 16, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0753)
On April 6, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 753 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 11, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 6, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB191ER)
On February 23, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: Criminal Justice
On February 14, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 966947184-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 966947184-H1
- Read second time
On February 11, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 966947184-H1
On January 17, 1996 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 10, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 962033184