+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 14, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0628)
On April 10, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 628 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 23, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 22, 1994 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 16, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB191ER)
On March 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (34-Y 4-N)
- Passed Senate (34-Y 4-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (37-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 1-N)
On February 3, 1994 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Read first time
On February 2, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute
- Committee substitute agreed to
- Read second time
On January 31, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD8813492 (HB191H1)
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Presented and ordered printed