+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 14, 2008 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0660)
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 660 (effective 7/1/08)
On March 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB191ER)
- Enrolled
On March 4, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 28, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2008 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Licensing
On January 17, 2008 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2008 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 083136672-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB191E
- Amendments by Delegate Orrock agreed to
- Read second time
On January 14, 2008 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 11, 2008 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 10, 2008 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On December 26, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 083136672
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 4, 2008: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2008: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2008: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
January 16, 2008: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 10, 2008: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor