+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0752)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 4-N)
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 752 (effective 7/1/13)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 14-N 2-A)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation #4 (86-Y 8-N 2-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 8-N 2-A)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation #'s 1, 2 and 3 (80-Y 14-N 2-A)
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1907ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1907ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Courts of Justice
- Rereferred from Transportation (9-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N 2-A)
- Read third time and passed House (92-Y 4-N 2-A)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1907H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104350D-H1
- Read second time
On February 2, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #1 Criminal
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103495D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
April 3, 2013: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 4-N)
April 3, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (80-Y 14-N 2-A)
April 3, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 8-N 2-A)
February 19, 2013: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N)
February 18, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice (8-Y 6-N)
February 13, 2013: Rereferred from Transportation (9-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (92-Y 4-N 2-A)
February 1, 2013: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (42)
Type:
Primary Sponsor