+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0786)
- Enacted, Chapter 786 (effective 7/1/11)
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1903ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (96-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 26, 2011 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1903ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1903E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 11100845D-E
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11100845D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 6, 2011: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 6, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2011: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 18, 2011: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor