+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N)
- Read third time and passed House (58-Y 40-N)
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 21100816D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1902E
- Amendment by Delegate Carr agreed to
- Read second time
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 7-N)
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21100816D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (14-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2021: VOTE: Passage (58-Y 40-N)
January 13, 2021: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (15-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor