+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 15, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0167)
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 167 (effective 7/1/95)
On February 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 1995 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 21, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1901ER)
On February 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 0-N 3-A)
On February 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Read first time
On February 7, 1995 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1995 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. LD8167432-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to LD8167432-H1
- Read second time
On February 5, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed LD8167432-H1
- Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed LD5617432
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 14, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1995: Reported from Commerce and Labor (9-Y 0-N 3-A)
February 7, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1995: Reported from C. I. B. w/sub. (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor