+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0475)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 475 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB190ER)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee amendment rejected (18-Y 20-N)
- VOTE: COMMITTEE AMENDMENT V (18-Y 20-N)
- Passed Senate (33-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (33-Y 6-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 1-N)
On February 17, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 16, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989364492-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989364492-H1
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989364492-H2
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (25-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989364492-H1
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 5, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 989364492-H1
- Reported from Claims with substitute (13-Y 3-N)
On January 21, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Claims sub-committee: 2
On January 15, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 983191264
- Referred to Committee on Claims
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (33-Y 6-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: COMMITTEE AMENDMENT V (18-Y 20-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendment (15-Y 1-N)
February 16, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (25-Y 0-N)
February 4, 1998: Reported from Claims with substitute (13-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor