+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 491 (effective 7/1/14)
On March 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB190ER)
- Enrolled
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Education and Health
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (91-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (91-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 17, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 16, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (11-Y 0-N)
On January 9, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: # 1
On December 23, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100827D