+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 21, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0472)
On April 14, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 472 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 25, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB19ER)
On March 11, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 1998 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (95-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 23, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/16/97 986151256
+ − Votes (5)
March 11, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1998: Reported from Tra. (26-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor