+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0183)
On March 9, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 183 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1899ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 9, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 071965204
+ − Votes (5)
February 12, 2007: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2007: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2007: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2007: Reported from Courts of Justice (19-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor