+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0450)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 450 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1899ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15100074D
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2015: Reported from General Laws (19-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor