+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0028)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 28 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 15, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 8, 2019
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1898ER)
- Enrolled
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (12-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1898H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19104868D-H1
- Read second time
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19104868D-H1
- Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19103851D