+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Stricken at the request of Patron in Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
- Read third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1898H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 077833204-H1
- Read second time
On February 3, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 077833204-H1
On February 2, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (17-Y 2-N)
On January 11, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law
On January 4, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078348204