+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 1997 in the House:
- Stricken from docket by C. J. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 22, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 1-N)
On January 14, 1997 in the House:
- Assigned to P. & E. sub-committee: 2
On January 8, 1997 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented & ordered printed 977514310
+ − Votes (2)
February 4, 1997: Stricken from docket by C. J. (22-Y 0-N)
January 22, 1997: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor