+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0722)
On March 28, 1999 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 722 (effective 7/1/99)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1999 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 9, 1999 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1896ER)
On February 25, 1999 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N)
On February 24, 1999 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 999152718-S1 (Mims)
- Read third time
- Substitute by Sen. Mims agreed to 999152718-S1
- Floor substitute printed 999152718-S1 (Mims)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Read second time and engrossed
- Communicated to Senate
- Printing dispensed
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1999 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 1999 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 15, 1999 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 992411130
- Consent to introduce
+ − Votes (8)
February 25, 1999: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1999: VOTE: RECONSIDER R (39-Y 0-N)
February 22, 1999: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 1999: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 1999: Reported from Courts of Justice (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor