+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- Left in Courts of Justice
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Civil Law
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Referred from Science and Technology by voice vote
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Science and Technology
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17101502D
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor