+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0403)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 403 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/26/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1893ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15103529D
+ − Votes (6)
February 20, 2015: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2015: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor