+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0138)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 138 (effective 7/1/21)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 25, 2021
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2021 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1892ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- Engrossment reconsidered by House
- Read second time and engrossed
- Passed by temporarily
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101070D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2021: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2021: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2021: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2021: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2021: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (98-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2021: Reported from Labor and Commerce (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor