+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0508)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 508 (effective 1/1/17)
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/10/15
On March 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1890ER)
- Enrolled
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 15105636D-H1
- Amended by conference committee
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senators: Stuart, Wagner, Carrico
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Delegates: Jones, Poindexter, Hester
- Conferees appointed by House
- House acceded to request
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 15105185D-S1 (2-Y 96-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1890S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105185D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105185D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 15101211D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1890E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101211D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (10)
February 27, 2015: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2015: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2015: VOTE: REJECTED (2-Y 96-N)
February 19, 2015: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2015: Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2015: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2015: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor