+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text reprinted (CHAP0471)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 471 (effective 7/1/21)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0471)
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 31, 2021
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 1, 2021
On February 26, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate reprinted (HB1888ER)
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1888ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 21200269D-S1 (53-Y 43-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 21200269D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1888S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N)
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 21200269D-S1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 19, 2021 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N)
- Read third time and passed House (55-Y 43-N)
On January 18, 2021 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 21101608D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1888E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 15, 2021 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/21 21101608D
+ − Impact Statements (9)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 23, 2021: VOTE: Adoption (53-Y 43-N)
February 19, 2021: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 17-N)
February 18, 2021: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2021: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (9-Y 6-N)
February 5, 2021: Continued to 2021 Sp. Sess. 1 in Privileges and Elections (15-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2021: VOTE: Passage (55-Y 43-N)
January 13, 2021: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment(s) (13-Y 9-N)
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor