+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 16, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0218)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 218 (effective 3/16/11)
On February 20, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1887ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2011 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 26, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11101369D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1887E
- Emergency clause added
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/11 11101369D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 14, 2011: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2011: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2011: Reported from General Laws and Technology (11-Y 0-N)
January 26, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2011: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2011: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor