+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0338)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 338 (effective 7/1/23)
On March 2, 2023 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 27, 2023
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2023
On February 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2023 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1886ER)
- Enrolled
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2023 in the House:
- VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2023 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 19, 2023 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/23 23102339D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Votes (5)
February 16, 2023: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2023: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2023: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2023: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2023: Reported from Commerce and Energy (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor