+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 24, 2005 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0071)
On March 20, 2005 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 71 (effective 1/1/06)
On March 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2005 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 7, 2005 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1885ER)
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 17, 2005 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendment by Sen. Chichester agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 16, 2005 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2005 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 5, 2005 in the House:
- Read second time
- Emergency clause deleted
- Committee substitute agreed to 053102540-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1885H1
On February 4, 2005 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 053102540-H1
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: #1
On January 7, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled & ord.printed w/emg.; offered 01/12/05 052925540
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 18, 2005: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 17, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2005: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2005: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2005: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 2, 2005: Reported from Finance with sub (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor