+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 13, 2013 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 290 (effective 7/1/13)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0290)
On February 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1885ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
- Printed as engrossed 13103178D-E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1885E
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Transportation
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: #1
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13103178D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2013: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2013: Reported from Transportation (15-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: Reported from Appropriations with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2013: Reported from Transportation (22-Y 0-N)
January 14, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor