+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0303)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 303 (effective 7/1/19)
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1884ER)
- Enrolled
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned Rehab sub: Subcommittee #2
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
- Read third time and passed House (95-Y 3-N)
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2019 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute rejected 19105835D-H1
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19105835D-H1
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 1-N)
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19100617D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 20, 2019: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2019: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2019: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2019: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services with amendment (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2019: VOTE: PASSAGE (95-Y 3-N)
January 17, 2019: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor