+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0263)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 263 (effective 7/1/17)
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 27, 2017
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/21/17
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 20, 2017 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1883ER)
- Enrolled
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 6-N)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2017 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 26, 2017 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/17 17102979D
+ − Votes (5)
February 15, 2017: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2017: Passed Senate (31-Y 8-N)
February 13, 2017: Reported from Commerce and Labor (7-Y 6-N)
January 30, 2017: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2017: Reported from Commerce and Labor (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor