+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 334 (effective 7/1/19)
On February 21, 2019 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1883ER)
- Enrolled
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1883H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 19104986D-H1
- Read second time
On January 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 19104986D-H1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101891D