+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 28, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
On April 8, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 739 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB188ER)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 2, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 31, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
On January 20, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Education sub-committee: 2
On January 12, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 007236724
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: Reported from Education and Health (14-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2000: Reported from Education (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor