+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (49)
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Communicated to Governor
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Requires 27 affirmative votes to pass in enrolled form
- Motion to pass in enrolled form rejected (23-Y 16-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ENROLLED FORM (67-Y 31-N 1-A)
- Passed in enrolled form (67-Y 31-N 1-A)
- VOTE: REJECTED (29-Y 67-N 1-A)
- House rejected Governor's recommendation (29-Y 67-N 1-N)
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/25/15
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1879ER)
- Enrolled
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1879S1
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105125D-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (23-Y 14-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105125D-S1 (62-Y 30-N 2-A)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (62-Y 30-N 2-A)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105125D-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (11-Y 3-N)
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 29-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (69-Y 29-N 1-A)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Read second time
- Floor substitute printed 15104942D-H2 (Toscano)
- Floor substitute printed 15104764D-H3 (Kilgore)
- Substitute by Delegate Kilgore agreed to 15104764D-H3
- Committee substitute rejected 15104738D-H1
- Substitute by Delegate Toscano rejected 15104942D-H2 (32-Y 61-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (32-Y 61-N)
- Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB1879H3
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2015 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 15104738D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (14-Y 6-N)
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 3-N)
On January 20, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101526D