+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0611)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 611 (effective 7/1/15)
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, March 29, 2015
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/27/15
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1878ER)
- Enrolled
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 15105183D-S1 (98-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Committee substitute agreed to 15105183D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1878S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 15105183D-S1
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2015 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 15101207D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1878E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/15 15101207D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 23, 2015: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2015: Passed Senate with substitute (38-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2015: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2015: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2015: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2015: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor