+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0002)
- Enacted, Chapter 2 (effective 2/16/11)
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1874ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2011 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2011 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 10, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On February 1, 2011 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1874ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On January 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On January 26, 2011 in the Senate:
- Read second time
On January 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 11103696D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1874E
- Amendment by Delegate Purkey agreed to
- Read second time
On January 18, 2011 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 17, 2011 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed with emergency clause; offered 01/12/11 11103696D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 16, 2011: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2011: VOTE: ADOPTION EMERGENCY (98-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2011: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2011: Reported from Finance (14-Y 0-N)
January 20, 2011: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2011: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor