+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0587)
On March 24, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 587 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1873ER)
On February 16, 2001 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate sub. w/amd. agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2001 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with sub. w/amd. (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. w/amd. 013397716-ES1
- Amendment by Sen. Hanger agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 013397716-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 12, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 013397716-S1
On January 30, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Printed as engrossed 013354716-E
On January 25, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 22, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with amd (28-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/05/01 013354716
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (7)
February 16, 2001: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2001: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/sub (15-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2001: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 22, 2001: Reported from Appropriations with amd (28-Y 0-N)
January 17, 2001: Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor