+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0575)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 575 (effective 7/1/13)
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1871ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 4-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (91-Y 4-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 3-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (12-Y 3-N)
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Public Education
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 6-N)
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1871H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104457D-H1
- Read second time
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104457D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Students and Early Education
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13101439D
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 19, 2013: VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 4-N)
February 18, 2013: Passed Senate with amendments (37-Y 3-N)
February 15, 2013: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2013: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (12-Y 3-N)
February 4, 2013: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 6-N)
January 28, 2013: Reported from Education with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
January 24, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor