+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 27, 2001 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0586)
On March 24, 2001 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 586 (effective 7/1/01)
On February 26, 2001 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2001 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2001 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1869ER)
On February 14, 2001 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2001 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2001 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 4, 2001 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 18-N)
On February 3, 2001 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 2001 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 31, 2001 in the House:
- Reported from Finance (14-Y 7-N)
On January 16, 2001 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 10, 2001 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 01/05/01 011755684
+ − Votes (5)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2001: VOTE: (39-Y 1-N)
February 13, 2001: Reported from Finance (15-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2001: VOTE: PASSAGE (80-Y 18-N)
January 31, 2001: Reported from Finance (14-Y 7-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor