+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (15-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 13104669D-H1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1868H1
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 13104669D-H1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: #1
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/13 13102564D
+ − Votes (4)
February 12, 2013: Passed by indefinitely in Finance with letter (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2013: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2013: Reported from Finance with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2013: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor