+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0087)
On February 21, 2007 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 87 (effective 7/1/07)
On February 14, 2007 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1867ER)
- Enrolled
On February 7, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2007 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (12-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2007 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 25, 2007 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2007 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources (Ware, R.L.)
On January 3, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/07 078968554