+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0741)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 741 (effective 7/1/09)
On March 6, 2009 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1866ER)
- Enrolled
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 2009 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2009 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2009 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 090260568-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1866E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On January 23, 2009 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2009 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
On January 16, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: Criminal
On January 12, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/14/09 090260568
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 25, 2009: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2009: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2009: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2009: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
January 19, 2009: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor