+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On April 11, 1995 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)
On April 7, 1995 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1862ER)
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 739 (effective 7/1/95)
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 6, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled
- Amended as sub. by Gov's recommendation LD0978812-H1
On April 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Gov's recommendation (98-Y 0-N)
On March 29, 1995 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed LD0978812-H1
On March 27, 1995 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 13, 1995 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 1995 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 3, 1995 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1862ER)
On February 23, 1995 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
On February 21, 1995 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amd. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 6, 1995 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Read first time
On February 4, 1995 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 1995 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 2, 1995 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 1995 in the House:
- Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 1995 in the House:
- Assigned to C. N. R. sub-committee: 5
On January 19, 1995 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Conservation and Natural Resources
- Presented & ordered printed LD9809000
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 6, 1995: VOTE: ADOPT GOV. RECOMMEND. (40-Y 0-N)
April 5, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1995: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
February 22, 1995: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 1995: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1995: Reported from A. C. & N. R. w/amd. (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 4, 1995: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 1995: Reported from Cons. & Natural Resources (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor